Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio María Elías Montoya, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni

Titular Bishop of Cumae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1945 BornMedina del Pomar, Spain
1 Sep 196015.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jul 196823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Nov 198641.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
17 Nov 198641.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cumae
25 Mar 198742.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cumae

MicroData Summary for Julio María Elías Montoya:
Bishop Julio María Elías Montoya O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of El Beni o Beni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013