Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Alfonso Escudero López-Brea

Prelate of Moyobamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1962 BornQuintanar de la Orden, Spain
9 Jul 198927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
8 Jul 200644.3AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Moyobamba, Peru
26 Aug 200644.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Moyobamba, Peru
21 Jul 200745.3SucceededPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Rafael Alfonso Escudero López-Brea:
Bishop Rafael Alfonso Escudero López-Brea (born ) Prelate of Moyobamba

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Moyobamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,227
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013