Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Agostinho da Rocha Noronha

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Guarda, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Bargala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1889Born
17 Apr 193646.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guarda, Portugal
17 Apr 193646.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bargala
19 Jun 193647.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bargala
7 Jul 193849.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Agostinho da Rocha Noronha
Bishop José Agostinho da Rocha Noronha (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReriz
Ordained BishopAssumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Viseu, Diocese of Viseu

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,936, Number 41
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast