Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Józef Długosz

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Częstochowa

Titular Bishop of Aggar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1941 BornCzestochowa
20 Jun 196524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
18 Dec 199352.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
18 Dec 199352.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aggar
6 Jan 199452.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aggar
7 May 201675.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Józef Długosz
Bishop Antoni Józef Długosz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Częstochowa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Częstochowa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,197
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016