Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Peter Michael Denning

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1907BornFlushing
21 May 193225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
24 Feb 195952.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
24 Feb 195952.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
22 Apr 195952.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
13 Apr 198275.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
12 Feb 199083.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Peter Michael Denning:
Bishop Joseph Peter Michael Denning (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013