Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Deitmer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1865BornMünster
17 Dec 188722.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
3 Mar 192357.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
3 Mar 192357.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sora
1 May 192357.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sora
15 Jan 192963.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Deitmer:
Bishop Joseph Deitmer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013