Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Dajczak

Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1949 BornKozminek
15 Jun 197526.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gorzów, Poland
15 Dec 198940.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gorzów, Poland
15 Dec 198940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Azura
6 Jan 199040.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azura
23 Jun 200758.4AppointedBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Dajczak:
Bishop Edward Dajczak (born ) Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013