Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Cullen

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1864Born
24 Jun 188925.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 192763.0AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
5 Jun 192763.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
2 Jan 193671.8DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Matthew Cullen
Bishop Matthew Cullen (born , died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHackettstown, Kilcarney

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018