Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Cracchi, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pult, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1831Born
24 May 187038.8AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
31 Jul 187039.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
22 Dec 188756.4DiedBishop of Pult, Albania

MicroData Summary for Alberto Cracchi
Bishop Alberto Cracchi O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Pult

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLandiona
Ordained BishopScutari

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 472
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1870, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Feb 2017