Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Costagliola, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1850Born
26 Oct 187525.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
15 Apr 190151.2AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
21 Apr 190151.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
15 Feb 191969.0DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Costagliola
Archbishop Gennaro Costagliola C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,920
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 545
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast