Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-Henri-Timoléon de Cossé-Brissac

Deceased

Bishop of Condom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1698BornParis
1 Apr 172425.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 173537.2AppointedBishop of Condom, France
22 Jan 173637.3Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
26 Aug 175758.9DiedBishop of Condom, France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-Henri-Timoléon de Cossé-Brissac:
Bishop Emmanuel-Henri-Timoléon de Cossé-Brissac (born , died ) Bishop of Condom

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013