Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon-Pierre de Lacoré (La Corée)

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1691Born
6 Dec 174453.5SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
19 Jul 174554.1ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
22 Aug 174554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
12 Sep 176372.2DiedBishop of Saintes, France

MicroData Summary for Simon-Pierre de Lacoré (La Corée)
Bishop Simon-Pierre de Lacoré (La Corée) (born , died ) Bishop of Saintes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Ouen-les-Paris

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018