Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcello Costalunga

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Aquileia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1925BornRoma, Italy
27 Mar 194823.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 199065.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
10 Dec 199065.9AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
6 Jan 199166.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
25 Jul 200176.6RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
5 May 201085.3DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Marcello Costalunga:
Archbishop Marcello Costalunga (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,297
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013