Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Joseph Cordileone

Archbishop of San Francisco, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1956 Born
9 Jul 198226.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Diego, California, USA
5 Jul 200246.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Diego, California, USA
5 Jul 200246.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Natchesium
21 Aug 200246.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Natchesium
23 Mar 200952.7AppointedBishop of Oakland, California, USA
5 May 200952.9InstalledBishop of Oakland, California, USA
27 Jul 201256.1AppointedArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA
4 Oct 201256.3InstalledArchbishop of San Francisco, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Joseph Cordileone (VIAF: 31163810220538820047)
Archbishop Salvatore Joseph Cordileone (born ) Archbishop of San Francisco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Diego, Diocese of San Diego, California
Ordained PriestOur Mother of Confidence, Church, San Diego, Diocese of San Diego, California
Ordained BishopUniversité de San Diego, Immaculata, Church, San Diego, Diocese of San Diego, California

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Francisco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,240
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2012
  • i: Website of the Diocese, 27 Jul 2012
  • c1: CB, 19 May 2022
  • op.loc: CB, 2 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 3 Nov 2022