Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Conway

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1722¹Born
22 Sep 175331.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 177957.1AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
20 Jun 177957.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
19 Jun 179674.4DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Conway:
Bishop Denis Conway (born 1722, died ) Bishop of Limerick

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1779, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015