Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop André Constant], O.P. †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Lot-et-Garonne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1736Born
1 May 179154.8SelectedBishop of [Lot-et-Garonne (Constitutional), France]
5 Jun 179154.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Lot-et-Garonne (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³65.2ResignedBishop of [Lot-et-Garonne (Constitutional), France]
11 Jun 181174.9DiedBishop Emeritus of [Lot-et-Garonne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Constant
Bishop André Constant O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lot-et-Garonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Maigrin
Ordained BishopBordeaux
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast