Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Colombo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Victoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1909BornOlginate
19 Sep 193122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Mar 196454.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Mar 196454.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Victoriana
25 Apr 196455.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Victoriana
28 Oct 198576.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Feb 199181.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Colombo:
Bishop Carlo Colombo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013