Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Colbert

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Port Elizabeth

Titular Bishop of Olbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1898BornCork, Ireland
19 Jun 192123.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 193941.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
13 Jun 193941.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Olbia
29 Oct 193941.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olbia
Sep 1948³50.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
8 Jan 195556.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Port Elizabeth, South Africa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Colbert:
Bishop James Colbert (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Port Elizabeth

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013