Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Piero Coccia

Archbishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1945 BornAscoli Piceno
25 Nov 197227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
28 Feb 200458.2AppointedArchbishop of Pesaro, Italy
24 Apr 200458.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pesaro, Italy
30 May 200458.5InstalledArchbishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Piero Coccia:
Archbishop Piero Coccia (born ) Archbishop of Pesaro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pesaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013