Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serafino Cimino, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Peru

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1873Born
1898²24.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1915²41.2AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
1921²47.2CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
18 Dec 192451.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
18 Dec 192451.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
11 Jan 192551.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
May 1925³51.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to México
13 Apr 192652.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
4 May 192854.5DiedApostolic Nuncio to Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Serafino Cimino
Archbishop Serafino Cimino O.F.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Peru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapri, Italy

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 1
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast