Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Cieślik

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Titular Bishop of Britonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1940 BornCzernice
25 Jun 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
3 Dec 199454.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
3 Dec 199454.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Britonia
6 Jan 199554.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Britonia
19 Sep 201575.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Cieślik (VIAF: 166296665)
Bishop Paweł Cieślik (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,464
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Dec 2016