Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Maria Cieri

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1840Born
30 May 186323.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189353.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Policastro, Italy
12 Jun 189353.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
18 Jun 189353.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canopus
22 Jun 189656.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
22 Jan 189958.6SucceededBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
12 Nov 191070.4DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Maria Cieri
Bishop Ferdinando Maria Cieri (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfranci, Diocese of Nusco
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 80, and Page 178
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017