Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Chirappanath

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

Titular Bishop of Slebte

Titular See: (Europe/Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1961 BornPuthenchira
26 Dec 198726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabar), India
28 Jul 201654.5AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator)
28 Jul 201654.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Slebte
1 Nov 201654.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Slebte

MicroData Summary for Stephen Chirappanath
Bishop Stephen Chirappanath (born ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator)

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Sep 2016
  • c34: CB, 30 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Nov 2016