Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Certo Garipoli

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1849Born
15 Apr 190151.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
15 Apr 190151.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
21 Apr 190151.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
22 Feb 191161.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Certo Garipoli
Bishop Francesco Certo Garipoli (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCondr˛

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1901, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018