Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito Nicola Cavanna

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1916BornMasio
18 May 194024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
20 Jan 196043.8AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
27 Mar 196044.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
21 Jun 197155.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Asti, Italy
21 Jun 197155.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lilybaeum
1 Aug 197761.3SucceededBishop of Asti, Italy
20 Feb 198063.9DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito Nicola Cavanna:
Bishop Vito Nicola Cavanna (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1974
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013