Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Ernesto Castrillo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1904BornPietravairano
11 Jun 192723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Sep 195349.6AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
13 Dec 195349.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
17 Oct 195551.7DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Ernesto Castrillo:
Bishop Agostino Ernesto Castrillo O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013