Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sauveur Casanova

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1918BornCorte
24 Feb 194526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ajaccio, France
13 Aug 198769.1AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
15 Oct 198769.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
5 Jan 199576.5RetiredBishop of Ajaccio, France
26 May 199879.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Sauveur Casanova:
Bishop Sauveur Casanova (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,163
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015