Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ Alfredo Caires de Nobrega, S.C.I.

Bishop of Mananjary

Apostolic Administrator of Farafangana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1951 BornCanišo, Portugal
28 Dec 198029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
30 Oct 200049.5AppointedBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
18 Mar 200149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mananjary, Madagascar
Apr 2014²63.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Farafangana, Madagascar

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Alfredo Caires de Nobrega:
Bishop JosÚ Alfredo Caires de Nobrega S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Mananjary

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mananjary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,932
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014