Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Vitus Burg

Deceased

Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1768BornOffenburg
26 Sep 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
182152.3IncardinatedPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
28 Jan 182859.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
28 Jan 182859.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
28 Sep 182860.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
29 Sep 182961.0AppointedBishop of Mainz, Germany
12 Jan 183061.3InstalledBishop of Mainz, Germany
22 May 183364.7DiedBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Vitus Burg (VIAF: 67235808)
Bishop Joseph Vitus Burg (born , died ) Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 268, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016