Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Brand

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1776BornMespelbrunn
11 Mar 180225.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
6 Jul 180226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
21 May 182750.9AppointedBishop of Limburg, Germany
21 Oct 182751.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
26 Oct 183357.3DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob Brand (VIAF: 35265041)
Bishop Jakob Brand (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 239
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016