Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Antonio Buccolini, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Río Gallegos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1930BornFerré
24 Nov 195727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Jul 199262.5AppointedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
26 Sep 199262.7Ordained BishopBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
3 Oct 199262.7InstalledBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
25 Oct 200575.8RetiredBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina
6 Jun 201484.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Río Gallegos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Antonio Buccolini:
Bishop Alejandro Antonio Buccolini S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Río Gallegos

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,926
  • d: CB, 7 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014