Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Arturo Bravo Álvarez

Bishop of San Felipe, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1962 Born
20 Apr 199734.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Valparaíso, Chile
12 Oct 199734.7Ordained PriestPriest of Valparaíso, Chile
26 May 202057.4AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
15 Aug 202057.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Felipe, Chile

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Arturo Bravo Álvarez
Bishop Gonzalo Arturo Bravo Álvarez (born ) Bishop of San Felipe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso
Ordained PriestCathedral, Valparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso
Ordained BishopSanta Teresa de los Andres, Crypt, San Felipe, Diocese of San Felipe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Felipe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2020
  • ln/od/c1: CB, 26 May 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Jul 2020
  • c34: CB, 14 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Aug 2020

Quantcast