Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gorgon Gregory Brandsma, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kisumu

Titular Bishop of Bargala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1874BornSneck, Netherlands
23 Sep 189925.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
2 Dec 192551.4AppointedPrefect of Kavirondo, Kenya
11 Jul 193359.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bargala
11 Jul 193359.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kisumu, Kenya
7 Nov 193359.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bargala
20 Jun 193561.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Kisumu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Gorgon Gregory Brandsma:
Bishop Gorgon Gregory Brandsma M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kisumu

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013