Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartol Bozanić

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1789³Born
14 Jul 181122.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
19 Mar 181222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
4 Feb 183949.8SelectedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
8 Jul 183950.2ConfirmedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
6 Oct 183950.4Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
23 Aug 185465.3DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartol Bozanić (VIAF: 305631138)
Bishop Bartol Bozanić (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerbenico, Diocese of Krk (Veglia)
Ordained BishopGorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018