Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Carlo Borromeo

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1893Born
30 Mar 191824.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 195158.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lodi, Italy
4 Nov 195158.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Choma
2 Dec 195158.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Choma
28 Dec 195259.1AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
4 Jul 197581.6DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Carlo Borromeo
Bishop Luigi Carlo Borromeo (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraffignana

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1951, Number 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast