Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop András Bőle

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1762³BornSzarvaskend
29 Oct 178624.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 178624.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 182462.2SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
21 Mar 182562.5ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
25 Jun 182562.8Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
4 Jun 184380.7DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for András Bőle:
Bishop András Bőle (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013