Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Romanus Bilsborrow, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Cius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1862Born
25 Jan 188421.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jun 188926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Sep 191048.0AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
24 Feb 191148.4Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
7 Feb 191653.4AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
16 Dec 192058.3ResignedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
16 Dec 192058.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cius
19 Jun 193168.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Romanus Bilsborrow
Archbishop James Romanus Bilsborrow O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cardiff

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalton-Ie-Dale, Preston, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, Chapel, Douai, Nord, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Edmund, Abbey, Upper Woolhampton, Reading, Berkshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Death PlaceBelle Rose, St-Pierre-de-Moka, Diocese of Port-Louis, Mauritius
Buried Place (Original)St. Louis, Cathedral, Port-Louis, Diocese of Port-Louis, Mauritius

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 17
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 35
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c1: CL, 30 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast