Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santo Bergamo

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1909Born
4 Aug 193324.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 196960.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rossano, Italy
15 Dec 196960.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasabe
25 Jan 197060.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasabe
18 Nov 197162.4AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
11 Oct 198071.3DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Santo Bergamo
Bishop Santo Bergamo (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla San Giovanni

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast