Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Bellido Caro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jerez de la Frontera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1924BornArcos de la Frontera
7 Nov 194824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Nov 197349.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Nov 197349.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutia
30 Dec 197349.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutia
3 Mar 198056.0AppointedBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
29 Jun 200076.3RetiredBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
16 Mar 200480.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Bellido Caro:
Bishop Rafael Bellido Caro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jerez de la Frontera

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013