Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Baldassarri

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1836Born
9 Apr 185922.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 185922.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 189457.6AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
24 May 189457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
15 Apr 190164.5AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
9 Nov 191276.0DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Baldassarri (VIAF: 88782912)
Bishop Francesco Baldassarri (born , died ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopCollege Lombard, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 102, and Page 320
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017