Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Srecko Badurina, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1930BornPag
1 Nov 195222.5ProfessedMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
29 Jun 195525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
4 Dec 198757.6AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
6 Jan 198857.7Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
17 Sep 199666.3DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Srecko Badurina:
Bishop Srecko Badurina T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,428
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013