Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Augustin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1847Born
17 Apr 187426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
10 Mar 191062.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
10 Mar 191062.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
25 Apr 191062.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
16 Sep 191971.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Karl Augustin
Bishop Karl Augustin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlbersdorf, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Jul 2020

Quantcast