Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Archdeacon, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Killala


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1735SelectedBishop of Killala, Ireland
30 Sep 1735ConfirmedBishop of Killala, Ireland
5 Feb 1736Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
10 Apr 1739DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Peter Archdeacon:
Bishop Peter Archdeacon O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Killala

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1736, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015