Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafino Angelini

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1848Born
21 Mar 187425.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189344.7AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
18 Jun 189344.8Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
30 Nov 189648.2AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
4 Feb 190859.4DiedBishop of Avellino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Angelini (VIAF: 90337555)
Bishop Serafino Angelini (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarsoli, Diocese of Marsi
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103, and Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017