Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Angerami

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Turres Concordiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1956Born
22 Jun 199740.5Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Sep 201457.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Sep 201457.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Concordiae
8 Nov 201457.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Concordiae
7 Jul 201962.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Angerami
Bishop Salvatore Angerami (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)First Immaculate Conception Chapel, Cemetery, Poggioreale, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Sep 2014
  • c34: CB, 29 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,319
  • d: CB, 7 Jul 2019
  • loc: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast