Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Angelucci

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1868Born
1 May 189325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Palestrina, Italy
29 Aug 191042.3AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
19 Mar 191142.8Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
2 May 194981.0DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Angelucci
Bishop Giuseppe Angelucci (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenazzano
Ordained BishopSts. John and Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1911, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,934

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast