Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Amato, S.D.B.

Prefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1938 BornMolfetta, Italy
22 Dec 196729.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Dec 200264.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sila
19 Dec 200264.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
6 Jan 200364.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sila
9 Jul 200870.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
20 Nov 201072.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
20 Nov 201072.4Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 201172.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
28 Feb 201374.7CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
16 Mar 201374.8ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary for Angelo Amato:
Cardinal Angelo Amato S.D.B. (born ) Prefect of Causes of Saints

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,304
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013