Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Álvarez Afonso

Bishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1949 BornBreña Alta
16 Jul 197627.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
29 Jun 200555.9AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
4 Sep 200556.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Álvarez Afonso:
Bishop Bernardo Álvarez Afonso (born ) Bishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,970

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013