Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Webster Allen

Deceased

Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1844Born
4 Dec 187026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
10 Apr 189753.0AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
16 Jun 189753.2Ordained BishopBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
13 May 190864.1DiedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Samuel Webster Allen
Bishop Samuel Webster Allen (born , died ) Bishop of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth Place78 Lord Street, Stockport, Cheshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Central District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Alban, Church, Liscard, Wallasey, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady and St. Peter of Alcantara, Cathedral, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Death PlaceCathedral House, Belmont, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 493
  • op/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 24
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 36
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 23 Mar 2018