Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Dean Alleyne, O.S.B.

Bishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1951 Born
8 Dec 197524.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Jul 198533.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Oct 200351.9AppointedBishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles
30 Jan 200452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Georgetown, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Francis Dean Alleyne
Bishop Francis Dean Alleyne O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Georgetown

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoint-à-Pierre, Trinidad & Tobago

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Georgetown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,519

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017